MD HB636 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB992

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "elevated level of lead" for purposes of certain provisions of law requiring the periodic testing for the presence of lead in drinking water outlets in occupied public and nonpublic school buildings; requiring by August 1, 2022, a school to take certain remedial measures on a drinking water outlet tested on or before June 1, 2021, if the test indicated a concentration of lead that was more than 5 parts per billion but less than 20 parts per billion; and providing for the construction of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Buildings - Drinking Water Outlets - Elevated Level of Lead (Safe School Drinking Water Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 237
2021-04-12HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-10SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-10SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-04-02SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-26SenateReferred Rules
2021-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed (132-1)
2021-03-24HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-24HouseFavorable with Amendments {120218/1 Adopted
2021-03-24HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-01-26HouseHearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2021-01-22HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB992 (Carry Over) 2020-02-28 - Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means
SB546 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment61501(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment61502(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment61503(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback