MD SB992 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB636
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "elevated level of lead" for purposes of certain provisions of law requiring the periodic testing for the presence of lead in drinking water outlets in occupied public and nonpublic school buildings; and requiring by August 1, 2021, a school to take certain remedial measures on a drinking water outlet tested on or before June 1, 2020, if the test indicated a concentration of lead that was more than 5 parts per billion but less than 20 parts per billion.
Title
School Buildings - Drinking Water Outlets - Elevated Level of Lead (Safe School Drinking Water Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Floor Amendment {833022/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {404338/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB992 (Carry Over) 2020-02-28 - Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means
HB1475 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
HB1475 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Education, State Department of
Environment
Environment, Department of the
General Services, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Occupational Safety
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Time
Water
Weights and Measures
Education, State Department of
Environment
Environment, Department of the
General Services, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Occupational Safety
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Time
Water
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 6 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 6 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 6 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |