MD HB595 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1483
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an exception to motor vehicle registration requirements for personal delivery devices; authorizing a personal delivery device to operate on any roadway, sidewalk, shoulder, footpath, bicycle trail, or crosswalk in the State; prohibiting a personal delivery device from being operated in certain manners; creating certain marking, equipment, and insurance requirements for personal delivery devices being operated on roadways, sidewalks, shoulders, or crosswalks; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {380516/1 Adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1483 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
SB726 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
SB726 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Subjects
Bicycles
Counties
Delivery Services
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Equipment
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Highways
Identification
Insurance
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Pedestrians
Reports
Safety
Sidewalks
Signs and Billboards
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Weights and Measures
Zoning and Planning
Counties
Delivery Services
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Equipment
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Highways
Identification
Insurance
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Pedestrians
Reports
Safety
Sidewalks
Signs and Billboards
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Weights and Measures
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 11 | 135 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 11 | 176 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 13 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 104.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |