MD SB726 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB874

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing an exception to motor vehicle registration requirements for personal delivery devices; authorizing a personal delivery device to operate on any roadway, sidewalk, shoulder, footpath, bicycle trail, or crosswalk in the State; creating certain marking, equipment, and insurance requirements for personal delivery devices being operated on roadways, sidewalks, shoulders, or crosswalks; requiring an operator of a personal delivery device to comply with certain local laws; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-04-12SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2021-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {430214/1 Adopted
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-03-20HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2021-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2021-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-18SenateFloor Amendment {423726/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {448070/1 Adopted
2021-03-18SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2021-03-18SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {448070/1
2021-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-26SenateHearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
2021-02-26SenateHearing canceled
2021-02-09SenateHearing 3/04 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-02-05SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB595 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
SB874 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation11135(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation11176(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation13402(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation17103(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation21104.5(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation211201(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation211205.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation21501.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation8409(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0726?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0726f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0726t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0726e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_351_sb0726e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0726_44807001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0726_42372601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0726_43021401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0726_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0726_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0601.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1305.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1214.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback