MD HB564 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Aging to pay to certain low-income seniors up to a $1,500 subsidy from State general funds to help low-income seniors reside in assisted living programs; increasing, except under certain circumstances, a certain subsidy in effect for certain periods of time based on annual growth in the consumer price index; requiring an applicable area agency to determine the amount of the monthly subsidy for a resident of an assisted living program and, in doing so, to make a certain deduction for personal expenses; etc.
Title
Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Finance Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-3) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {384763/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-04 | House | Reassigned to Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB670 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Subjects
Aging, Department of
Assisted Living
Consumer Price Index
Elderly
Elderly Persons
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Poverty
State Aid
Assisted Living
Consumer Price Index
Elderly
Elderly Persons
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Poverty
State Aid
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 10 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |