MD HB560 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB106

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the housing policy of the State to include providing for fair housing to all citizens regardless of reentry-into-society status; prohibiting a person from refusing to sell or rent a dwelling to any person because of reentry-into-society status; prohibiting a person from discriminating against any person in the terms, conditions, or privileges of the sale or rental of a dwelling because of reentry-into-society status; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-01-26HouseHearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

HB106 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government201103(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20701(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20702(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20703(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20704(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20705(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20707(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback