MD HB51 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a local governing body, on application by a property owner for a special exception to construct or operate a landfill in an area zoned for residential use, to require an environmental justice analysis, paid for by the property owner, describing any potentially adverse environmental, health, and economic impacts to the area; requiring the Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities to recommend strategies for State oversight of local zoning decisions that present environmental justice concerns; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zoning - Environmental Justice Considerations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-10-31HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB121 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Land Use1401(n/a)See Bill Text
Land Use10103(n/a)See Bill Text
Land Use4215(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback