MD SB121 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a local governing body, on receipt of an application for a special exception to construct or operate a permitted facility in an area zoned for residential use, to require the preparation, at the applicant's expense, of a detailed analysis of the environmental and public health impacts of the permitted facility on the surrounding community; requiring the Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities to recommend strategies for increasing State support in addressing environmental justice concerns; etc.
Title
Zoning - Environmental Justice Considerations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {224134/1 Adopted |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-27 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB51 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Air Pollution
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Counties - Generally
Demographics
Environment
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Examinations
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Public Buildings and Facilities
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Residential Property
Zoning and Planning
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Counties - Generally
Demographics
Environment
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Examinations
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Public Buildings and Facilities
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Residential Property
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Land Use | 1 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 10 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 4 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |