MD HB500 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a rehabilitation with at least 30 residential rental units is ineligible for the Maryland Sustainable Communities Tax Credit unless the individual or business entity seeking the certification agrees to set aside at least 10% of the residential rental units as housing for households whose median income does not exceed 60% of the area median income; and applying the Act to initial credit certificates issued on or after July 1, 2015.
Title
Sustainable Communities Tax Credit - Residential Units for Lower-Income Individuals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |