MD HB493 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 756
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 756
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that an individual serve beer, wine, and liquor under a Harford County stadium beer, wine, and liquor license only in plastic, Styrofoam, or paper containers; and authorizing an individual to serve beer, wine, and liquor in a glass container in an area in the stadium designated by the license holder to hold a special event.
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Service Under Stadium License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 756 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {983525/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB481 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Emergency Bills
Harford County
Health
Safety
Stadiums
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Emergency Bills
Harford County
Health
Safety
Stadiums
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |