MD HB434 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB941
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Baltimore City to decrease or raise to a previously established level the maximum speed limit on a highway under its jurisdiction without performing an engineering and traffic investigation; and prohibiting a local jurisdiction from using a speed monitoring system to enforce speed limits on any portion of a highway for which the speed limit has been decreased without performing an engineering and traffic investigation.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 107 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (107-25) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {323027/1 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-28) |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB941 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
SB520 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
SB520 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Subjects
Baltimore City
Electronic Surveillance
Highways
Jurisdiction
Motor Vehicle Operation
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Electronic Surveillance
Highways
Jurisdiction
Motor Vehicle Operation
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |