MD HB941 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB434
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Baltimore City to decrease or raise to a previously established level the maximum speed limit on a highway under its jurisdiction without performing an engineering and traffic study; and prohibiting a local jurisdiction from implementing a new speed monitoring system to enforce speed limits on any portion of a highway for which the speed limit has been decreased without performing an engineering and traffic investigation.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-11) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {870814/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB941 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Highways
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Prince George's County
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Boundaries
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Highways
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Prince George's County
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |