MD HB411 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a consumer member and a pharmacist to the Statewide Advisory Commission on Immunizations; repealing the termination date of the Commission; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with MedChi, the Maryland State Medical Society, to appoint the chair of the Commission; etc.
Title
Statewide Advisory Commission on Immunizations - Membership, Duties, and Sunset
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Del. James Hubbard [D] | Del. Wade Kach [R] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Veronica Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | Re-assigned Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-22 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Diseases
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Immunization
Public Information
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Diseases
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Immunization
Public Information
Reports
Safety
Sunset