MD HB386 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the eligible uses of the Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account to include the provision of grants and the conversion of certain loan amounts into grants in Anne Arundel County and the City of Annapolis when in a declared local state of emergency; limiting to $50,000 the amount of certain grants and loan amounts converted to grants for a single business or nonprofit organization; and establishing the Workgroup to Study the Establishment of a State Disaster Relief Fund.
Title
Anne Arundel County and City of Annapolis - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-5) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {683823/1 Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-7) |
2022-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {423924/1 Adopted |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB310 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Subjects
Annapolis
Anne Arundel County
Casinos
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Economic Development
Emergencies
emermand
Grants
Loans
Lottery
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Small Business
Sunset
Women
Anne Arundel County
Casinos
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Economic Development
Emergencies
emermand
Grants
Loans
Lottery
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Small Business
Sunset
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 5 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |