MD HB386 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Human Resources to establish child support performance incentive model offices; requiring the Secretary to establish a specified performance incentive program; authorizing conciliation conferences; authorizing the Secretary to adopt regulations; and requiring the Secretary to evaluate the model offices and to report to the General Assembly by specified dates.
Title
Family Law - Child Support Enforcement - Performance Incentive Model Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-01 | Re-assigned Appropriations | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Courts
Human Resources, Department of
Minors
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
State Employees
Summonses
Support of Dependents
Courts
Human Resources, Department of
Minors
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
State Employees
Summonses
Support of Dependents
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0386.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0386f.pdf |