MD HB363 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting an official or employee from retaliating against an individual for reporting or participating in an investigation of a violation of the Maryland Public Ethics Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Public Ethics Law - Retaliation for Reporting or Participating in Investigation - Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-12HouseThird Reading Passed (131-1)
2021-02-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-05HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-09-15HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB4 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-19 - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions5101(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions5509(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback