MD SB4 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an official or a State employee from accepting a gift from an association, or any entity acting on behalf of an association, that is engaged only in representing counties or municipal corporations; and prohibiting an official or employee from retaliating against an individual for reporting or participating in an investigation of a potential violation of the Maryland Public Ethics Law.
Title
Public Ethics - Officials and Employees - Acceptance of Gifts and Prohibited Retaliation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-13) |
2021-04-12 | House | Floor Amendment {793222/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected |
2021-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {904137/1 Adopted |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB363 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Ethics
Gifts
Harassment
Investigations and Inquiries
Public Officials
State Employees
Threats
Violence
Work, Labor, and Employment
Ethics
Gifts
Harassment
Investigations and Inquiries
Public Officials
State Employees
Threats
Violence
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |