MD HB34 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health to authorize a certain health care practitioner at an approved school-based health center to provide health care services through telehealth under certain circumstances; prohibiting the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health from establishing certain requirements for a certain school-based health center to provide health care services through telehealth; etc.
Title
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Floor Amendment 633627/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 93 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Floor Amendment 633627/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 93 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-14) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | Floor Amendment {633627/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (39-93) |
2021-03-11 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Cox) Adopted |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means |
2020-10-08 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB278 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Subjects
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
internet
Private Schools
Public Health
Public Schools
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Video
Virtual Environments
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
internet
Private Schools
Public Health
Public Schools
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Video
Virtual Environments