MD HB326 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the issuance of not more than 12 additional winery special event permits to specified wineries for use in specified farmers' markets in Baltimore County; prohibiting a winery from using more than 6 winery special event permits at the same farmer's market in Baltimore County in a year; prohibiting a holder of a permit from selling wine by the glass; and requiring that a specified individual who is certified by an alcohol awareness program be present during the hours when wine may be sold.
Title
Baltimore County - Winery Special Event Permits - Farmers' Markets
Sponsors
Del. Susan Aumann [R] | Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Del. William Frank [R] | Del. Stephen Lafferty [D] |
Del. Dana Stein [D] | Del. Michael Weir [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-23 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-20 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2011-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-02 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agriculture
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Transient Merchants
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Transient Merchants