MD HB316 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1377
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain defendants placed in private home detention as a condition of pretrial release from the requirement to pay a monitoring fee if the defendant qualifies as an indigent individual or if a home detention monitoring device is provided by the State or a local jurisdiction; establishing the Workgroup on Home Detention Monitoring to study and make recommendations regarding the costs and availability of both publicly and privately provided pretrial home detention monitoring systems; requiring a certain report; etc.
Title
Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597 |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-43) |
2021-04-12 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {648677/1 Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-40) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {192813/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-15 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB23 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-09 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1377 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1377 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Law - Procedure
defendants
Electronic Surveillance
Federal Aid
Fees
Home Detention
Indigent Persons
Pretrial Detention or Release
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Criminal Law - Procedure
defendants
Electronic Surveillance
Federal Aid
Fees
Home Detention
Indigent Persons
Pretrial Detention or Release
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 5 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 4 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |