MD HB297 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB833
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering procedures that a law enforcement officer and a court are required to follow when the law enforcement officer or court has reason to believe that a child who has been detained is a victim of sex trafficking or a victim of human trafficking; providing that a minor may not be criminally prosecuted or proceeded against under certain provisions of law for a certain offense if the minor committed the offense as a direct result of being a victim of sex trafficking or being a victim of human trafficking; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687 |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2023-04-10 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {103028/1 Adopted |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {103028/1 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2023-02-22 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-20 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2023-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB833 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
SB292 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 686
SB292 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 686
Subjects
Burglary
Child Custody
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Drivers' Licenses
Evidence
Fraud
Hearings
Human Trafficking
Identification
Juvenile Law
Law Enforcement
Minors
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Notices
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Perjury
Prostitution
Sexual Offenses
Social Services
Theft
Trespass
Vandalism
Victims
Child Custody
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Drivers' Licenses
Evidence
Fraud
Hearings
Human Trafficking
Identification
Juvenile Law
Law Enforcement
Minors
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Notices
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Perjury
Prostitution
Sexual Offenses
Social Services
Theft
Trespass
Vandalism
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-17.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 8 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 1 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |