MD HB833 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB297
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering procedures that a law enforcement officer and a court are required to follow when the law enforcement officer or court has reason to believe that a child who has been detained is a victim of sex trafficking or human trafficking; providing that a minor may not be criminally prosecuted or proceeded against under certain provisions of law for a certain offense if the minor committed the offense as a direct result of sex trafficking or being a victim of human trafficking; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report {433423/1 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Shetty and Munoz) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Shetty and Munoz) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Carter and Cassilly) |
2022-04-11 | House | Senate Refuses Recede |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Carter and Cassilly) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Refuses Recede |
2022-04-11 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2022-04-11 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2022-04-11 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {143423/1 Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-5) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {413029/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB833 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
SB768 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
SB768 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Civil Actions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disclosure
Hearings
Human Services, Department of
Human Trafficking
Juvenile Law
Law Enforcement
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Prostitution
Social Services
Social Workers
Victims
Civil Actions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disclosure
Hearings
Human Services, Department of
Human Trafficking
Juvenile Law
Law Enforcement
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Prostitution
Social Services
Social Workers
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-17.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 1 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 11 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 11 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 1 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |