MD HB292 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a health care provider to transmit the uniform consultation referral form electronically; and requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner, in consultation with the Maryland Health Care Commission, to adopt by regulation standards for the electronic transmission of the data elements contained in the uniform consultation referral form.
Title
Health Insurance - Uniform Consultation Referral Form - Electronic Transmission
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Del. Robert Costa [R] | Del. John Donoghue [D] |
Del. Donald Elliott [R] | Del. Peter Hammen [D] | Del. Dan Morhaim [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-23 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-22 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-19 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2010-02-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Electronic Commerce
Forms
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance Administration
Physicians
Rules and Regulations
Forms
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance Administration
Physicians
Rules and Regulations