MD HB277 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 148
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 148
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health and the Department of Human Services, to develop and distribute guidelines on a trauma-informed approach to assist schools with understanding and responding to an individual with symptoms of chronic interpersonal trauma or traumatic stress; and requiring the State Department of Education to distribute the trauma-informed approach guidelines to each local school system and publish the guidelines on the Department's website.
Title
State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 148 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {485566/1 Adopted |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB367 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Communications
Counselors
Curriculum
Data
Education
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Examinations
Health
Health, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Interest
Investments
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Health
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Rural Areas
School Administration
Social Services - Generally
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Treasurers
Urban Areas
Counselors
Curriculum
Data
Education
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Examinations
Health
Health, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Interest
Investments
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Health
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Rural Areas
School Administration
Social Services - Generally
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Treasurers
Urban Areas