MD HB270 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB338
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an innkeeper to establish and maintain a computerized record-keeping system for guest transactions and receipts; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services and the Maryland Department of Labor to approve educational training programs for the accurate and prompt identification and reporting of suspected human trafficking; and requiring an innkeeper to take certain actions to provide employees with training on the prevention, identification, and reporting of human trafficking.
Title
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Maintenance of Guest Records and Employee Human Trafficking Awareness Training and Policy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487 |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-12) |
2022-04-07 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-13) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {543020/1 Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-13) |
2022-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {363223/1 Adopted |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB338 (Carry Over) 2020-12-29 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
SB91 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
SB91 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Subjects
Business Regulation
Commerce and Business
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Education
Hotels and Motels
Human Trafficking
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Signs and Billboards
Time
Victims
Video
Commerce and Business
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Education
Hotels and Motels
Human Trafficking
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Signs and Billboards
Time
Victims
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 15 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 15 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 15 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |