MD HB255 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1
Note: Carry Over of previous HB18
Note: Carry Over of previous HB18
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring producers of architectural paint or a representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Paint Stewardship Program to the Department of the Environment on or before July 1, 2024, and in accordance with certain requirements; requiring the Department to review and approve certain plans, including a certain assessment, submitted in accordance with the Paint Stewardship Program; prohibiting the sale of certain architectural paint under certain circumstances beginning January 1, 2025; etc.
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-12) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {603322/1 Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {603322/1 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {603322/1 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-34) |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2023-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB255 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (35-12)
SB260 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-07 - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
HB18 (Carry Over) 2022-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB260 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-07 - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
HB18 (Carry Over) 2022-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Architects
Auditors and Audits
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Data
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Commerce
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
internet
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Recycling
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Volunteers
Weights and Measures
Auditors and Audits
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Data
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Commerce
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
internet
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Recycling
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Volunteers
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1733 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1734 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |