MD HB245 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating in Howard County a beer, wine and liquor tasting (BWLT) license; specifying to whom the license may be issued; setting maximum limits on the amounts of alcoholic beverages that may be served under a BWLT license; setting the annual license fee; authorizing the Howard County Board of License Commissioners to adopt rules or regulations to implement the Act; etc.
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-23 | Re-assigned Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-31 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Howard County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Howard County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations