MD HB227 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definitions of "information technology" and "major information technology development project" for the purpose of certain provisions of law governing information processing and security; requiring a unit of State government to submit certain information to the Secretary of Information Technology relating to a major information technology development project; altering certain responsibilities of the Secretary relating to major information technology development projects; etc.
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Major Information Technology Development Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {593223/1 Adopted |
2024-02-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2023-09-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB294 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-15 - Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m.
Subjects
Accessibility - see also- Blind; Deaf; DevDisPer; PhysDisPer
Administrative Agencies
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Cybersecurity
Education
Electronic Government
Examinations
Human Infrastructure
Information Technology - Generally
Information Technology, Department of
Procurement
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Administrative Agencies
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Cybersecurity
Education
Electronic Government
Examinations
Human Infrastructure
Information Technology - Generally
Information Technology, Department of
Procurement
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 3.5 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3.5 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3.5 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 5 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |