MD HB208 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $15 to $30 the State per diem for jury service under certain circumstances.
Title
Courts - Payment for Jury Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-4) |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-01-14 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB775 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 546
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 8 | 426 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |