MD HB204 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-07 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-07 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Aviation Commission to consider certain types of impacts of decisions of the Commission or the Maryland Aviation Administration when carrying out certain provisions of law; requiring the Commission to consider information and advice from certain additional stakeholders; requiring that certain members of the Commission appointed by the Governor be recommended by certain county Senate delegations; etc.
Title
Maryland Aviation Commission - Duties, Composition, and Member Orientation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-07 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-3) |
2023-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {113024/1 Adopted |
2023-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB162 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Subjects
Airports
Committees and Commissions
Reports
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Reports
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 3 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 5 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 5 | 201.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |