MD HB188 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on personal property of a grocery store that completes certain construction and is located in a certain healthy food priority area; requiring the governing body of Prince George's County to designate what constitutes a healthy food priority area for purposes of the tax credit based on certain factors; providing that the tax credit may not exceed a certain amount; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Credits - Grocery Stores PG 409-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {105765/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Construction
Food
Laws and Ordinances
Mass Transit
Municipal Corporations
Personal Property
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Salaries and Compensation
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Transportation
Food
Laws and Ordinances
Mass Transit
Municipal Corporations
Personal Property
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Salaries and Compensation
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Transportation