MD HB174 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a taxpayer to pay a $100 fee to the Maryland Tax Court if the taxpayer appeals a determination regarding an assessment of an income-producing property valued greater than $5,000,000 and the Court does not grant the taxpayer relief on appeal.
Title
Property Tax Assessment - Unsuccessful Appeals to Maryland Tax Court - Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-19) |
2024-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {393223/1 Adopted |
2024-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2023-09-10 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB279 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-09 - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 14 | 512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |