MD HB1633 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Baltimore County Board of Education to elect a chair and vice chair by a quorum of a majority of the voting members then serving rather than by a majority vote of the members present and voting.
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Election of Officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-24 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2020-02-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB1055 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Baltimore County
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Emergency Bills
Public Officials
Voting
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Emergency Bills
Public Officials
Voting
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1633?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1633f.pdf |