MD HB162 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Limiting the requirement that insurers that issue or deliver medical professional liability insurance policies in the State offer, in addition to the basic policy, additional policies with certain deductibles to insurers that issue or deliver a policy with an annual premium of $5,000 or more.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Mandated Deductible Levels - Limitation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-20SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-02-19HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-02-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-14HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-01-23HouseHearing 1/31 at 1:30 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback