MD HB1504 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Mar 5 @ 1:00 pm House Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to submit an interim report on or before December 1, 2020, and a final report on or before December 1, 2021, to certain committees of the General Assembly; terminating the Act after May 31, 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB1015 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback