MD HB244 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1504
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-04 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-04 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding barriers to providing mental health services on campus, the use of telemedicine, video conferencing and hotlines, and implementation of counseling services; requiring the Task Force to submit an interim report on or before December 1, 2021, and a final report on or before December 1, 2022, to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-04 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2020-10-23 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB161 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
HB1504 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1504 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counselors
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Reports
Rural Areas
Sexual Offenses
Students
Substance Abuse
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment
Communications
Counselors
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Reports
Rural Areas
Sexual Offenses
Students
Substance Abuse
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0244?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0244f.pdf |