MD HB1504 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to submit an interim report on or before December 1, 2020, and a final report on or before December 1, 2021, to certain committees of the General Assembly; terminating the Act after May 31, 2022; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1504 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
SB1015 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
SB1015 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Health Care Facilities
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Reports
Rural Areas
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Counselors
Health Care Facilities
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Reports
Rural Areas
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1504?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1504f.pdf |