MD HB1481 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, for a development with 11 or more homes to be built by the same builder, a home builder to provide a purchaser with written information on energy-efficient options, including a statement that tax credits may be available related to the energy-efficient options, available for installation in a new home; and requiring a contract for the initial sale of a new home to contain a certain acknowledgment that the purchaser was provided with certain information about energy-efficient options for the home.
Title
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-15) (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (30-15) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2018-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Building Codes
Construction
Contracts
Disclosure
Energy Matters
Housing
Notices
Real Estate
Real Property
Tax Credits
Building Codes
Construction
Contracts
Disclosure
Energy Matters
Housing
Notices
Real Estate
Real Property
Tax Credits