MD HB1433 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Highway Administration to designate Maryland Route 210 as the Piscataway Highway.
Title
State Highways – Designations – Piscataway Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160 |
2022-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {933628/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Highways
Names
Signs and Billboards
State Highway Administration
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Names
Signs and Billboards
State Highway Administration
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 8 | 663 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |