MD HB14 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an exemption for a person who is a retired former member of the armed forces of the United States from the requirement to obtain a hunting license under specified circumstances; providing that the exemption applies only to hunting on specified farmland that is under specified ownership; and requiring a person who hunts under the exemption to possess a retired-military identification card, specified written permission to hunt from the property owner, and any required hunting stamps.
Title
Hunting Licenses - Exemption for Retired Members of the Armed Forces
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216 |
2015-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-02-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {880514/1 Report Adopted |
2015-02-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-01-28 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-01-20 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2014-11-17 | House | Pre-filed |