MD HB1385 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB313
Note: Carry Foward to future HB561
Note: Carry Foward to future HB561
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Town of Mount Airy, Carroll County and Frederick County, to undertake and carry out certain urban renewal projects for slum clearance and redevelopment; prohibiting certain land or property from being taken for certain purposes without just compensation first being paid to the party entitled to the compensation; declaring that certain land or property taken in connection with certain urban renewal powers is needed for public uses or purposes; etc.
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1385 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1385 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1385 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appraisals
Banks and Trust Companies
Bonds
Building Codes
Carroll County
Circuit Courts
Codes
Condemnation
Contracts
Deeds
Federal Government
Financial Institutions
Forests and Parks
Frederick County
General Assembly
Gifts
Grants
Hearings
Highways
Inspections
Insurance
Land Records
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Loans
Mortgages
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
News Media
Notices
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Information
Real Estate
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Savings and Loan Associations
Sidewalks
Surveyors
Titles
Urban Renewal
Utilities
Appraisals
Banks and Trust Companies
Bonds
Building Codes
Carroll County
Circuit Courts
Codes
Condemnation
Contracts
Deeds
Federal Government
Financial Institutions
Forests and Parks
Frederick County
General Assembly
Gifts
Grants
Hearings
Highways
Inspections
Insurance
Land Records
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Loans
Mortgages
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
News Media
Notices
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Information
Real Estate
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Savings and Loan Associations
Sidewalks
Surveyors
Titles
Urban Renewal
Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Municipal Charter | A1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Municipal Charter | A1 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Municipal Charter | A1 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Municipal Charter | A1 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Municipal Charter | A1 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Municipal Charter | A1 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Municipal Charter | A1 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Municipal Charter | A1 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Municipal Charter | A1 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Municipal Charter | A1 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Municipal Charter | A1 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Municipal Charter | A1 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Municipal Charter | A1 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Municipal Charter | A1 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |