MD HB561 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1385
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Granting the Town of Mount Airy in Carroll County and Frederick County the authority to exercise urban renewal powers within an urban renewal area under Article III, Section 61 of the Maryland Constitution; and authorizing the municipality to levy certain taxes and issue general obligation bonds and revenue bonds to carry out urban renewal powers.
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124 |
2023-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB313 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
HB1385 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1385 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Bonds
Building Maintenance and Repair
Carroll County
Charters
Community Facilities and Services
Condemnation
Contracts
Frederick County
Grants
Hearings
Highways
Inspections
Insurance
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Loans
Monuments and Memorials
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Notices
Public Information
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Urban Renewal
Zoning and Planning
Appropriations
Bonds
Building Maintenance and Repair
Carroll County
Charters
Community Facilities and Services
Condemnation
Contracts
Frederick County
Grants
Hearings
Highways
Inspections
Insurance
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Loans
Monuments and Memorials
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Notices
Public Information
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Urban Renewal
Zoning and Planning