MD HB1384 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a school vehicle to be equipped with a rear-facing flashing advisory sign to warn drivers of other vehicles of the presence of the school vehicle when it is about to engage in certain activity that requires care in approaching, overtaking, or passing the school vehicle; establishing certain standards and requirements for flashing advisory signs; authorizing the placement of a front-facing flashing advisory sign on a school vehicle under certain circumstances and subject to certain standards and requirements; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles - School Vehicles - Flashing Advisory Signs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Safety
School Buses
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Motor Vehicles
Safety
School Buses
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections