MD HB1330 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revising provisions relating to the Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority; altering the application and scope of certain provisions relating to underground facilities and damage prevention; requiring certain newly installed underground facilities to be detectable or locatable on or after October 1, 2021; requiring certain previously detectable or locatable facilities to be restored to a certain status after a certain date; altering the qualifications of certain members of the Authority; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB877 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions1101(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions1110(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12103(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12107(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12111(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12112(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12113(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12117(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12120(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12121(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12124(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12125(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12126(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12127(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12128(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12129(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12130(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12131(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities12135(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback