MD HB1280 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a separate technical collective bargaining unit within the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission in which employees have a combination of basic scientific or technical knowledge and manual skill that is usually acquired through specialized postsecondary school education or through equivalent on-the-job training; altering a provision of law that had established a certain joint office/technical collective bargaining unit to establish a separate office collective bargaining unit; and providing for the application of the Act.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-17) (Y: 117 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-17) (Y: 117 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (116-17) |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {184968/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Bi-County Agencies
Collective Bargaining
District of Columbia
Higher Education
Job Training
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Public Employees
Unions
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
District of Columbia
Higher Education
Job Training
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Public Employees
Unions
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Work, Labor and Employment