MD HB1279 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the purposes of the Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program; establishing the Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Fund in the Department of Commerce to finance the provision of rental assistance to business entities located in RISE zones; prohibiting the Secretary of Commerce from approving a Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise (RISE) zone exceeding 500 acres; altering eligibility for tax incentives that a business entity that locates in a RISE zone may receive; etc.
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-4) |
2021-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {655461/1 Adopted |
2021-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB778 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Subjects
Allegany County
Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Cybersecurity
Dorchester County
Economic and Community Development
Enterprise Zones
Garrett County
Industry and Technology
Leases and Rent
Municipal Corporations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Somerset County
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property - Local
Time
Weights and Measures
Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Cybersecurity
Dorchester County
Economic and Community Development
Enterprise Zones
Garrett County
Industry and Technology
Leases and Rent
Municipal Corporations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Somerset County
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property - Local
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 5 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 725 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 733 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 9 | 103.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |