MD HB1275 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an administrative law judge to complete a training course on special education law before conducting a mediation session or due process hearing related to special education on or after August 1, 2020; establishing certain criteria for a certain training course; prohibiting an administrative law judge from conducting a certain mediation session or due process hearing under certain circumstances; requiring the Office of Administrative Hearings to convene a certain committee for a certain purpose; etc.
Title
Office of Administrative Hearings - Administrative Law Judges - Special Education Law Training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2019-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 11:30 a.m. |
2019-02-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Curriculum
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Discipline
Discrimination
Education
Examinations
Hearings
Job Training
Judges
Mediation
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Special Education
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Personnel
Time
Victims
Committees and Commissions
Curriculum
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Discipline
Discrimination
Education
Examinations
Hearings
Job Training
Judges
Mediation
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Special Education
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Personnel
Time
Victims