MD HB1260 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish a certain new unit to assist in evaluating and reviewing certain proposals for new programs and substantial modifications of existing programs; requiring the Governor, in each of fiscal years 2023 through 2031, to include in the annual State operating budget $57,700,000 to be allocated to certain historically black colleges and universities; establishing the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Reserve Fund; specifying the purpose and uses of the Fund; etc.
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-2) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {664763/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB1043 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-27 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Subjects
Advertising
Appropriations
Budgets
Curriculum
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Interest
Investments
Minorities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Appropriations
Budgets
Curriculum
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Interest
Investments
Minorities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 10 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 206.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 15 | 126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 15 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |