MD HB1260 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish a certain new unit to assist in evaluating and reviewing certain proposals for new programs and substantial modifications of existing programs; requiring the Governor, in each of fiscal years 2023 through 2031, to include in the annual State operating budget $57,700,000 to be allocated to certain historically black colleges and universities; establishing the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Reserve Fund; specifying the purpose and uses of the Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-16HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-13SenateReferred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (129-2)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {664763/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB1043 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-27 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education10214(n/a)See Bill Text
Education11206.3(n/a)See Bill Text
Education15126(n/a)See Bill Text
Education15127(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback