MD HB123 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for income from the cancellation of consumer credit card debt unless the individual's federal adjusted gross income exceeds $50,000 for an individual or $80,000 for a married couple filing a joint return; providing that the amount of the subtraction modification may not exceed $5,000 for an individual or $8,000 for a married couple filing a joint return; and applying the Act to tax years after 2012.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Credit Card Debt Forgiveness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-17 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |